TX HB913 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of the possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of certain prohibited explosive weapons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of the possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of certain prohibited explosive weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#679 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - RV#678 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Point of order overruled RV#616 (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-15SenateRead first time
2017-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed as amended
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02HouseRecord vote
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB913
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00913I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00913H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00913E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00913S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00913F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB913&RcdVtNo=616&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB913&RcdVtNo=678&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB913&RcdVtNo=679&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=152

Bill Comments

feedback