TX HB91 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the establishment by The University of Texas System of a law school in the Rio Grande Valley.
Title
Relating to the establishment by The University of Texas System of a law school in the Rio Grande Valley.
Sponsors
Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Aaron Pena [D] |
Rep. Tara Ybarra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-04 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Lawyers
RIO GRANDE VALLEY
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Lawyers
RIO GRANDE VALLEY
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM