TX HB897 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to safety requirements for a person directly operating an amusement ride.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to safety requirements for a person directly operating an amusement ride.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1121 (Y: 86 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amended RV#1084 (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1121
2019-05-08HousePassed
2019-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1084
2019-05-07HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-07HouseAmended 1-Ortega
2019-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-23HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-09HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback