TX HB896 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creating a criminal offense regarding the breach of computer security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creating a criminal offense regarding the breach of computer security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-17 - House - HB 896Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-05-28 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-18HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-15SenateRecord vote
2015-05-15SenatePassed
2015-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-15SenateRecord vote
2015-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-23SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-04-23SenateRead first time
2015-04-20SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-17HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-17HouseRecord vote
2015-04-17HousePassed
2015-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-16HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-16HouseAmended
2015-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-03-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-02-26HouseRead first time
2015-01-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback