TX HB89 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state contracts with and investments in companies that boycott Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state contracts with and investments in companies that boycott Israel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passed (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#344 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#335 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-02 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-04-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-04-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-04-27HouseSenate passage reported
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenatePassed
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-24SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-04-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-04-24SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19HouseRecord vote
2017-04-19HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB89
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00089I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00089H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00089E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00089S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00089F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB89&RcdVtNo=317&Ch=H&Dt=04/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB89&RcdVtNo=335&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB89&RcdVtNo=344&Ch=H&Dt=04/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=10

Bill Comments

feedback