TX HB89 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the transportation of certain mental health patients.
Title
Relating to the transportation of certain mental health patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-26 | Correction in referral | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |