TX HB887 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to telemedicine medical services and telehealth services covered by certain health benefit plans or provided by a pharmacist.
Title
Relating to telemedicine medical services and telehealth services covered by certain health benefit plans or provided by a pharmacist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB228 (Similar To) 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
TELEMEDICINE
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
TELEMEDICINE