TX HB884 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the law enforcement authority of federal border patrol agents.
Title
Relating to the law enforcement authority of federal border patrol agents.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-09 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 602 |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB602 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB602 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB602 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
Subjects
Aliens
BORDER
BORDER PATROL AGENTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
GULF OF MEXICO
HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE CHECKPOINTS
BORDER
BORDER PATROL AGENTS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
GULF OF MEXICO
HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF
VEHICLE CHECKPOINTS