TX HB879 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the qualifications required to hold the office of constable in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the qualifications required to hold the office of constable in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Keith Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#140 (Y: 120 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#140 |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed |
2023-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONSTABLES
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Law Enforcement
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Law Enforcement