TX HB861 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to membership of the state continuing advisory committee for special education services.
Title
Relating to membership of the state continuing advisory committee for special education services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-29 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Education | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING ADVISORY PANEL ON SPECIAL EDUCATION
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Governor
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Governor