TX HB852 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to nonpayment of hospitals under the state Medicaid program for certain preventable adverse conditions.
Title
Relating to nonpayment of hospitals under the state Medicaid program for certain preventable adverse conditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB353 (Same As) 2009-02-17 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance