TX HB833 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of educational programs for persons placed on community supervision for certain intoxication offenses.
Title
Relating to the administration of educational programs for persons placed on community supervision for certain intoxication offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID