TX HB832 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the abatement of mosquitoes in stagnant water located on certain uninhabited residential property.
Title
Relating to the abatement of mosquitoes in stagnant water located on certain uninhabited residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-03 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-03 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-04-29 | House | Postponed |
2013-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PESTICIDES & HERBICIDES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Safety
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
PESTICIDES & HERBICIDES
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Safety