TX HB821 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the solicitation of pen pals by certain inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to the solicitation of pen pals by certain inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-04 | House | Filed |