TX HB818 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution and punishment of the criminal offense of harassment; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution and punishment of the criminal offense of harassment; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2021-05-11HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 530
2021-05-10HousePostponed 5/11/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-10HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-03HousePostponed 5/10/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB530 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB530 (Similar To) 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback