TX HB810 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of certain investigational stem cell treatments to patients with certain severe chronic diseases or terminal illnesses and regulating the possession, use, and transfer of adult stem cells; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of certain investigational stem cell treatments to patients with certain severe chronic diseases or terminal illnesses and regulating the possession, use, and transfer of adult stem cells; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1973 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1242 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-15SenateRead first time
2017-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB810
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00810I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00810H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00810E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00810S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00810F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB810&RcdVtNo=1242&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=97
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB810&RcdVtNo=1973&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=42

Bill Comments

feedback