TX HB81 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the disclosure under the public information law of certain information related to parades, concerts, or other entertainment events open to the general public that are paid for with public funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the disclosure under the public information law of certain information related to parades, concerts, or other entertainment events open to the general public that are paid for with public funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#70 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Amended RV#65 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Effective immediately
2019-05-17 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-03HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-02HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-21HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-21HouseRecord vote RV#70
2019-03-21HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20HouseRecord vote RV#65
2019-03-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-20HouseAmended 1-Cain and Canales
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB402 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback