TX HB805 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials by patients with severe chronic diseases.
Title
Relating to access to certain investigational drugs, biological products, and devices that are in clinical trials by patients with severe chronic diseases.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INFORMED CONSENT
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL FREEDOM ACT
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INFORMED CONSENT
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL FREEDOM ACT
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS