TX HB804 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the entitlement of a lessee of property who is required to pay the ad valorem taxes on the property to receive notice of the appraised value of the property.
Title
Relating to the entitlement of a lessee of property who is required to pay the ad valorem taxes on the property to receive notice of the appraised value of the property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1515 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts