TX HB80 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-15)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of a portable wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle; creating a criminal offense; modifying existing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of a portable wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle; creating a criminal offense; modifying existing criminal penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - House - HB 80Third Reading House (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - HB 80Third Reading House (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 14 by Dutton (Y: 77 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 13 by Dutton (Y: 83 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 12 by Simpson (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 by Dutton (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 5 by Dutton (Y: 73 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 3 by Schofield (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-12SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-11SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-07SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-05SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-04-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-04-21SenateRead first time
2015-03-30SenateReceived from the House
2015-03-26HouseReported engrossed
2015-03-26HouseRecord vote
2015-03-26HousePassed
2015-03-26HouseRead 3rd time
2015-03-25HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HouseAmendment tabled
2015-03-25HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-03-25HouseVote reconsidered
2015-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HouseAmendment tabled
2015-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HouseAmendment tabled
2015-03-25HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-03-25HouseAmended
2015-03-25HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-03-25HouseAmended
2015-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HouseAmendment tabled
2015-03-25HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HouseAmendment tabled
2015-03-25HouseAmended
2015-03-25HouseRecord vote
2015-03-25HouseAmended
2015-03-25HouseAmended
2015-03-25HouseAmended
2015-03-25HouseRead 2nd time
2015-03-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-03-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-03-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-03-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-03-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-09HouseReferred to Transportation
2015-02-09HouseRead first time
2014-11-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00080I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00080H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00080E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00080S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=85&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=86&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=87&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=88&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=89&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=90&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=91&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB80&RcdVtNo=95&Ch=H&Dt=03/26/2015

Bill Comments

feedback