TX HB8 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cybersecurity for state agency information resources.
Title
Relating to cybersecurity for state agency information resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1948 (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Amended RV#390 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Amended RV#390 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House discharges conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | House | House discharges conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-04-25 | House | Amended |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-24 | House | Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER SECURITY COUNCIL
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RANGERS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
TEXAS CYBERSECURITY ACT
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
RANGERS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
TEXAS CYBERSECURITY ACT