TX HB787 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the security of the electric grid.
Title
Relating to the security of the electric grid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1087 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
Legislature
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Governor
Legislature
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Electric