TX HB780 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a bone marrow donor recruitment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a bone marrow donor recruitment program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#146 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-03SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-03HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-28SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-04-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#146
2021-04-09HousePassed
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-08HouseAmended 1-Lambert and Hunter
2021-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB780
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00780I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00780H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00780E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00780S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00780F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00780H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00780I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00780H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00780H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00780E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00780E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB780&RcdVtNo=146&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback