TX HB780 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to eligibility requirements for a beginning police department position in certain municipalities under municipal civil service.
Title
Relating to eligibility requirements for a beginning police department position in certain municipalities under municipal civil service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Passed | |
2009-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time | |
2009-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB765 (Same As) 2009-03-04 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Law Enforcement