TX HB776 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the removal of certain information from personal financial statements filed by certain persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the removal of certain information from personal financial statements filed by certain persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1913 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#343 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably as amended
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Administration
2017-04-26SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19HouseRecord vote
2017-04-19HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2017-01-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback