TX HB768 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of personal leave during school holidays by certain school district employees.
Title
Relating to the use of personal leave during school holidays by certain school district employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-02-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE