TX HB76 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cardiac assessments of high school participants in extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League.
Title
Relating to cardiac assessments of high school participants in extracurricular athletic activities sponsored or sanctioned by the University Interscholastic League.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1746 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#83 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Passed RV#84 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#83 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Passed RV#84 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1746 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Alvarado |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-26 | House | Record vote RV#83 |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-02-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1921 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Education
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE