TX HB76 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain purchases by a state agency performing a law enforcement function.
Title
Relating to certain purchases by a state agency performing a law enforcement function.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Law Enforcement
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Law Enforcement
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions