TX HB756 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on the name of a general-purpose political committee.
Title
Relating to restrictions on the name of a general-purpose political committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB756 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00756I.htm |