TX HB744 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to recovery of attorney's fees in certain civil cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to recovery of attorney's fees in certain civil cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#73 (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#69 (Y: 75 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - 2-Meyer RV#68 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-18SenateRead first time
2017-03-20SenateReceived from the House
2017-03-15HouseReported engrossed
2017-03-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-03-15HouseRecord vote
2017-03-15HousePassed
2017-03-15HouseRead 3rd time
2017-03-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-03-14HouseRecord vote
2017-03-14HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-03-14HouseRecord vote
2017-03-14HouseAmended
2017-03-14HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-03-14HouseAmended
2017-03-14HouseRead 2nd time
2017-03-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-03-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback