TX HB74 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to persons authorized to control the disposition of the remains of certain members of the United States armed forces.
Title
Relating to persons authorized to control the disposition of the remains of certain members of the United States armed forces.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Farias [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Jim Landtroop [R] | Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] |
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-09 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-06 | Senate adopts resolution recalling from Gov. | |
2011-05-05 | House adopts resolution recalling from Gov. | |
2011-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-04-26 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-04-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-10 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-10 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-03 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-03 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |