TX HB735 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to events to receive funding through a major events trust fund.
Title
Relating to events to receive funding through a major events trust fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-02-22 | Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--General
TRUSTS
County Government
County Government--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--General
TRUSTS