TX HB728 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment by the State Board of Education of an advanced computer science program for high school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment by the State Board of Education of an advanced computer science program for high school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#342 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective immediately
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-16HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenatePassed
2017-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-04SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Education
2017-04-26SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-20HouseAmended
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19HouseRecord vote
2017-04-19HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-21HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-12-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback