TX HB727 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of home telemonitoring services under Medicaid.
Title
Relating to the use of home telemonitoring services under Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#644 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
TELEMEDICINE
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
TELEMEDICINE