TX HB721 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the hunting or fishing license fee waiver for certain disabled veterans.
Title
Relating to the hunting or fishing license fee waiver for certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - HB 721Third Reading House (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
Military & Veterans
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses