TX HB714 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the civil prosecution of offenses involving certain municipal parking ordinances; authorizing a civil fine.
Title
Relating to the civil prosecution of offenses involving certain municipal parking ordinances; authorizing a civil fine.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Gary Elkins [R] |
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#668 (Y: 120 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#613 (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#613 (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-21 | House | Filed |