TX HB7 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the storage or disposal of high-level radioactive waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the storage or disposal of high-level radioactive waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#148 (Y: 119 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - House - Point of order sustained (amendment) RV#94 (Y: 94 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Effective immediately
2021-09-09 Signed by the Governor
2021-09-03 Sent to the Governor
2021-09-02HouseSigned in the House
2021-09-02SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-09-02SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-09-02HouseReported enrolled
2021-09-02HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-09-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-09-02HouseRecord vote RV#148
2021-09-02HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-09-02HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-09-01HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-09-01HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-09-01HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-09-01SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-09-01SenateRecord vote
2021-09-01SenatePassed
2021-09-01SenateRead 3rd time
2021-09-01SenateRecord vote
2021-09-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-09-01SenateRecord vote
2021-09-01SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-09-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-09-01SenateAmended
2021-09-01SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
2021-09-01SenateRead 2nd time
2021-09-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-09-01SenateOrdered not printed
2021-09-01SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-09-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-09-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-09-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-09-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-09-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-31SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-08-31SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-08-31SenateRead first time
2021-08-30SenateReceived from the House
2021-08-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-08-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-30HouseRecord vote RV#94
2021-08-30HousePassed
2021-08-30HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-08-30HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Craddick and Goodwin
2021-08-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-08-27HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-08-27HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-08-27HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Craddick
2021-08-27HouseAmended 1-Landgraf
2021-08-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-08-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-08-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-08-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-08-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB7
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00007I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00007E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00007S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/HB00007F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00007H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00007H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00007H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/HB00007S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00007I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/HB00007H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00007E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/HB00007E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/HB00007F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB7&RcdVtNo=94&Ch=H&Dt=08/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S209-01-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=HB7&RcdVtNo=148&Ch=H&Dt=09/02/2021

Bill Comments

feedback