TX HB7 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to municipal regulation of the removal of trees on private property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to municipal regulation of the removal of trees on private property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - FA8 Kolkhorst (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#171 (Y: 119 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-15 - House - Rules suspended RV#170 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - Senate - Vote reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-11 - Senate - (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#18 (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - Read 2nd time RV#10 (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
2017-08-16 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-15HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-15SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-08-15HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-08-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-15HouseRecord vote
2017-08-15HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-08-15HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-08-15HouseRecord vote
2017-08-15HouseRules suspended
2017-08-15House1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
2017-08-15HouseCorrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-08-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-08-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenatePassed
2017-08-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-08-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenateAmended
2017-08-15SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-15SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenateVote reconsidered
2017-08-15SenateRecord vote
2017-08-15SenateVote reconsidered
2017-08-15SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-08-15SenatePoint of order overruled
2017-08-15SenatePoint of order
2017-08-14SenateRecord vote
2017-08-14SenateVote reconsidered
2017-08-12SenateReturned from the House for further action
2017-08-12HouseReturned to the Senate for further action
2017-08-11HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-08-11HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-08-11HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenatePassed
2017-08-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-08-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateRecord vote
2017-08-11SenateAmended
2017-08-11SenateAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2017-08-11SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-08-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-08-11SenateRead 2nd time
2017-08-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-08-11SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-08-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-08-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-08-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-04SenateNo action taken in committee
2017-08-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-08-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-08-01SenateRead first time
2017-07-31SenateReceived from the House
2017-07-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-07-28HouseRecord vote
2017-07-28HousePassed
2017-07-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-07-27HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-07-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-07-27HouseRecord vote
2017-07-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-07-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-07-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-21HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2017-07-21HouseRead first time
2017-07-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB7
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00007I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00007E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00007S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00007F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB7&RcdVtNo=10&Ch=H&Dt=07/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB7&RcdVtNo=18&Ch=H&Dt=07/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-11-F2.PDF#page=23
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-11-F2.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-11-F2.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-11-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB7&RcdVtNo=170&Ch=H&Dt=08/15/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB7&RcdVtNo=171&Ch=H&Dt=08/15/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-14-F.PDF#page=27
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S108-15-F.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments

feedback