TX HB7 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain fiscal matters affecting governmental entities; reducing or affecting the amounts or rates of certain taxes, assessments, surcharges, and fees.
Title
Relating to certain fiscal matters affecting governmental entities; reducing or affecting the amounts or rates of certain taxes, assessments, surcharges, and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 7Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - HB 7Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 by Thompson, Senfronia (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - HB 7Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 7 by Thompson, Senfronia (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote reconsidered |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Returned from the House for further action |
2015-05-24 | House | Returned to the Senate for further action |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON STATE
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control