TX HB699 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring public institutions of higher education to establish a policy on campus sexual assault.
Title
Relating to requiring public institutions of higher education to establish a policy on campus sexual assault.
Sponsors
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] |
Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - HB 699Third Reading House (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Dukes (Y: 46 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Dukes (Y: 46 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
SEXUAL ASSAULT