TX HB681 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to restricting access to certain information that relates to a person convicted of or granted a dismissal after deferral of disposition for a fine-only misdemeanor offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to restricting access to certain information that relates to a person convicted of or granted a dismissal after deferral of disposition for a fine-only misdemeanor offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1843 (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#660 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2016-12-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback