TX HB681 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility for service retirement annuities of certain persons, including elected officials convicted of certain crimes.
Title
Relating to the eligibility for service retirement annuities of certain persons, including elected officials convicted of certain crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 681Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - HB 681Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - HB 681Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Ethics
Legislature
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
State Officers
Crimes--Miscellaneous
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Ethics
Legislature
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
State Officers