TX HB679 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study on homeless youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study on homeless youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-27 - House - HB 679Third Reading House (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - HB 679Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-17 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-27SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-27HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27HouseRecord vote
2015-05-27HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-25HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenatePassed
2015-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-24SenateAmended
2015-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2015-05-24SenateRecord vote
2015-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-23SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-04-23SenateRead first time
2015-04-20SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-16HouseRecord vote
2015-04-16HousePassed as amended
2015-04-16HouseAmended
2015-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-15HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-05HouseReferred to Human Services
2015-03-05HouseRead first time
2015-01-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback