TX HB678 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of a medication and the ordering and administration of an immunization or vaccination by a pharmacist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of a medication and the ordering and administration of an immunization or vaccination by a pharmacist.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#811 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#779 (Y: 44 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#811
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#779
2021-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Tinderholt
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2136 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB678
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00678I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00678H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00678E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00678H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00678I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00678H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00678H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB678&RcdVtNo=779&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB678&RcdVtNo=811&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback