TX HB673 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain reporting requirements for law enforcement agencies and to the creation of a criminal justice web portal by the office of the attorney general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain reporting requirements for law enforcement agencies and to the creation of a criminal justice web portal by the office of the attorney general.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2016-12-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback