TX HB671 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing the governor, and the lieutenant governor or another person when acting as governor, to retain executive authority while traveling within the contiguous 48 states of the continental United States.
Title
Relating to allowing the governor, and the lieutenant governor or another person when acting as governor, to retain executive authority while traveling within the contiguous 48 states of the continental United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time | |
2011-01-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR65 (Enabling for) 2011-04-11 - Considered in Calendars