TX HB670 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for ovarian cancer testing and screening.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage for ovarian cancer testing and screening.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Kyle Kacal [R] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
CANCER
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Women
CANCER
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Women