TX HB655 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the filing of a degree plan by students at public junior colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the filing of a degree plan by students at public junior colleges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#463 (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Read 2nd time RV#394 (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective immediately
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-04-27SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25HouseRecord vote
2017-04-25HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-27HouseRead first time
2016-12-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback