TX HB655 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Referred to Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to exempting defense base development authorities from certain contracting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exempting defense base development authorities from certain contracting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - House - HB 655Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-08SenateReferred to Economic Development
2013-05-08SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-14HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2013-02-14HouseRead first time
2013-01-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback