TX HB648 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice and information provided by a municipal solid waste facility and a commercial transporter of solid waste regarding recycling programs for certain electronic waste.
Title
Relating to notice and information provided by a municipal solid waste facility and a commercial transporter of solid waste regarding recycling programs for certain electronic waste.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2013-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Recycling
TELEVISION
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Recycling
TELEVISION